U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MENTOR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 17, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.