U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09101-1
  • Case Name: USA v.HILLS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.