U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TURNER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.