U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POLANCO-URENA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order of Dismissal]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Interpreter Appointed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.