U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GIRIMONTE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • March 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.