U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.