U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PAUL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.