U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POSADA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.