U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SAPHIRE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Letter]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.