U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALCANTARA-VELASCO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Submission Notice re Sentencing Materials]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.