U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DIAZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.