U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DE LA CRUZ NUNEZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.