U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARDONA REYES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 22, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.