U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MERCADO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 22, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.