U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAVEZ, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 29, 2022: [Revoke]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.