U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DIAZ-BAUTISTA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.