U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VON HOLST
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extradition Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.