U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STRIK, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Text Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 21, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 28, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 28, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.