U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Bond]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2023: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.