U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-mj-09132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOLGUIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 02, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2022: [Order]
  • April 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.