U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DREW et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.