U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FELDER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • October 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.