U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZHANG, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.