U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.