U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STRUBLE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Application/Petition]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order]
  • April 03, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.