U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILK & HONEY VENTURES, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Submission Notice re Sentencing Materials]
  • July 18, 2022: [Submission Notice re Sentencing Materials]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2022: [Application/Petition]
  • April 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.