U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLON et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 05, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.