U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-04019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IWASKO, IV
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 15, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Revoke]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.