U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DENG et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • November 15, 2022: [Release from Custody]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.