U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COVIL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 15, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 19, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.