U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SYED et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response in Support]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 04, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 17, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2022: [Order]
  • April 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 16, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 16, 2022: [Order]
  • April 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.