U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CULP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2022: [Order]
  • April 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.