U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BENTHALL et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.