U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRAXTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.