U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-06027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARSH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Certification]
  • April 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.