U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GIOVANNI HOYOS-JAIMES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.