U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-17026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CEASAR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.