U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LONON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.