U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GUZMAN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 05, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.