U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-02023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAFFET
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • April 28, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.