U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOYKINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.