U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CODIO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.