U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WADE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.