U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08142-2
  • Case Name: USA v. JENKINS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.