U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.