U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GUERRERO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.