U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08165-2
  • Case Name: USA v. OSEI-BONSU et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.