U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CASTRO-PENA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 17, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.