U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GONZALEZ-SABINO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 31, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.