U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09219-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.